The Contracting Parties,
Considering that NACA was formerly a joint FAO/UNDP project;
Considering that the NACA project was established as an independent economic organization by an agreement concluded on 8 January 1988, which entered into force on 11 January 1990;
Considering that Article 15.1 of the NACA Agreement provides that there should be a close working relationship between the Organization and FAO and that, to this end, the Organization should conclude an agreement pursuant to Article XIII of the FAO Constitution;
Recognizing the interest which FAO has in the development of aquaculture, fisheries and fishery resources and the vital role which aquaculture plays in the promotion and better use of fishery resources;
Have agreed as follows:
I. A close working relationship shall be established and maintained between NACA and FAO.
II. FAO shall participate in meetings of the Governing Council of NACA as an observer.
III. FAO shall participate in meetings of the Technical Advisory Committee of NACA as a member.
IV. The Regional Office for Asia and the Pacific (RAPA) will serve as a focal point for liaison between NACA and FAO.
V. The Contracting Parties may decide by mutual agreement to extend the scope of their cooperation as appropriate.
PROGRAMME COMMUTEE
(November 1991 - November 1993)
Chairman | Members | ||
Germany (D.F.R. Bommer) | Australia (J.B. Sharpe) | Kuwait(F.H.J. Hayat) | |
Barbados (R.C. Harris) | Lesotho(G.P.Khojane) | ||
Canada (E.W. Weybrecht)1 | Malaysia(B.Munip) | ||
Egypt (YAM. Hamdi) | Mexico(J.R.Lopez Portillo y Romano)2 | ||
India (V. Bhagwan) | Tunisia(A.Ben Romdhane) |
1 Replaced by Robert F. Andrigo as from the Sixty-fifth Session of the Programme Committee, September 1992
2Replaced by Chadli Laroussi as from the Sixty-sixth Session of the Programme Committee, February 1993
FINANCE COMMITTEE
(November 1991 - November 1993)
Chairman | Members | ||
Costa Rica (C. di Mottola Balestra) | Italy (G.L Valenza) |
Pakistan (M.S. Khan) | |
Lebanon (A. Abdel Malek) | Philippines (H.M. Carandang)2 | ||
Morocco (M.M. Sinaceur) |
Switzerland (R. de Pourtalès)3 | ||
Niger (S. Issaka) |
United States of America (G.J. Monroe)1 |
1 Replaced by William H. Marsh as from the Seventy-fourth Session of the Finance Committee, September 1992
2 Replaced by Marinela R. Castillo as from the Seventy-fifth Session of the Finance Committee, February 1993
3 Replaced by Igor Nikolaus Marincek as from the Seventy-sixth Session of the Finance Committee, May 1993
COMMITTEE ON CONSTITUTIONAL AND LEGAL MATTERS
(November 1991 - November 1993)
Chile | Libya |
France | Sri Lanka |
Italy | United States of America |
Kenya |
WFP COMMITTEE ON FOOD AID POLICIES AND PROGRAMMES (1993)
Term of office expiring | Elected by FAO Council | Elected by ECOSOC | ||
31 December. 1993 | Argentina | (C) | Belgium | (D) |
Brazil | (C) | Egypt | (A) | |
Burundi | (A) | El Salvador | (C) | |
China | (B-ll) | Indonesia | (B-ll) | |
Netherlands | (D) | Japan | (D) | |
Saudi Arabia, Kingdom of | (B-l) | Pakistan | (B-ll) | |
Tanzania | (A) | Sweden | (D) | |
31 December 1994 | Angola | (A) | Colombia | (C) |
Cameroon | (A) | Cuba | (C) | |
Democratic People's Republic | Ethiopia | (A) | ||
of Korea | (B-ll)1 | Ghana | (A) | |
France | (D) | Norway | (D) | |
Germany | (D) | Syria | (B-l) | |
Mexico | (C) | United Kingdom | (D) | |
Romania | (E) | |||
31 December 1995 | Australia | (D) | Denmark | (D) |
Bangladesh | (B-ll) | Dominican Republic | (C) | |
Burkina Faso | (A) | Hungary | (E) | |
Canada | (D) | India | (B-ll) | |
Guinea | (A) | Italy | (D) | |
Sri Lanka | (B-ll) | Niger | (A) | |
United States of America | (D) | Nigeria | (A) | |
1 This seat rotates between B-ll (1992-94) and B-l (1995-97)
FAO MEMBERS (161)
(as at 25 June 1993)
Afghanistan | Gambia | Oman |
Albania | Germany | Pakistan |
Algeria | Ghana | Panama |
Angola | Greece | Papua New Guinea |
Antigua and Barbuda | Grenada | Paraguay |
Argentina | Guatemala | Peru |
Australia | Guinea | Philippines |
Austria | Guinea-Bissau | Poland |
Bahamas | Guyana | Portugal |
Bahrain | Haiti | Puerto Rico |
Bangladesh | Honduras | (Associate Member) |
Barbados | Hungary | Qatar |
Belgium | Iceland | Romania |
Belize | India | Rwanda |
Benin | Indonesia | Saint Kitts and Nevis |
Bhutan | Iran, Islamic Republic of | Saint Lucia |
Bolivia | Iraq | Saint Vincent and the Grenadines |
Botswana | Ireland | Samoa |
Brazil | Israel | Sao Tome and Principe |
Bulgaria | Italy |
Saudi Arabia, Kingdom of |
Burkina Faso | Jamaica |
Senegal |
Burundi | Japan | Seychelles |
Cambodia | Jordan | Sierra Leone |
Cameroon | Kenya | Solomon Islands |
Canada | Korea, Republic of | Somalia |
Cape Verde | Kuwait | Spain |
Central African Republic | Laos | Sri Lanka |
Chad | Latvia | Sudan |
Chile | Lebanon | Suriname |
China | Lesotho | Swaziland |
Colombia | Liberia | Sweden |
Comoros | Libya | Switzerland |
Congo | Lithuania | Syria |
Cook Islands | Luxembourg | Tanzania |
Costa Rica | Madagascar | Thailand |
Cote d'Ivoire | Malawi | Togo |
Cuba | Malaysia | Tonga |
Cyprus | Maldives | Trinidad and Tobago |
Democratic People's Rep. of Korea | Mali | Tunisia |
Denmark | Malta | Turkey |
Djibouti | Mauritania | Uganda |
Dominica | Mauritius | United Arab Emirates |
Dominican Republic | Mexico | United Kingdom |
Ecuador | Mongolia | United States of America |
Egypt | Morocco | Uruguay |
El Salvador | Mozambique | Vanuatu |
Equatorial Guinea | Myanmar | Venezuela |
Estonia | Namibia | Viet Nam |
Ethiopia | Nepal | Yemen |
European Economic Community | Netherlands | Yugoslavia |
(Member Organization) | New Zealand | Zaire |
Fiji | Nicaragua | Zambia |
Finland | Niger | Zimbabwe |
France | Nigeria | |
Gabon | Norway |