1. The Hundred and Twenty-second Session of the Council was held in Rome on 14 November 2001, under the Chairmanship of Aziz Mekouar, Independent Chairman of the Council.
2. The Council adopted the Agenda as given in Appendix A of this Report.
3. The Council elected as Vice-Chairpersons for the session: Anton Kohler (Switzerland), David Blanco Zabala (Bolivia) and Ms Neela Gangadharan (India).
4. In conformity with the General Rules of the Organization, the Council elected the following to the Programme Committee for the period November 2001 to November 2003:
Chairperson: | Netherlands | (J. Berteling) |
Members: | Australia | (B. Hughes) |
Cameroon | (M. Samatana) | |
Canada | (B. Hankey) | |
China | (Z. Tang) | |
Colombia | (B. Gutiérrez Zuluaga Botero) | |
Lebanon | (A.H. Haidar) | |
Malaysia | (R. Bin Khalid) | |
Mali | (M.M. Touré) | |
Paraguay | (Ms A.M. Baiardi Quesnel) | |
Sudan | (M.S.M.A. Harbi) |
5. In conformity with the General Rules of the Organization, the Council elected the following to the Finance Committee for the period November 2001 to November 2003:
Chairperson: | Chile | (H.O. Molina Reyes) |
Members: | Japan | (M. Ito) |
Kuwait | (Ms F.J. Hayat) | |
Pakistan | (A.B. Khan) | |
Senegal | (A. Diouf) | |
Switzerland | (R. Gerber) | |
Tanzania, United Republic of | (Ms P.M. Hingi) | |
United Kingdom | (A. Beattie) | |
United States of America | (Ms C. Heileman) |
6. In conformity with the General Rules of the Organization, the Council elected the following seven Member Nations to the Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters for the period November 2001 to November 2003:
Canada
France Iraq Malta |
Niger Philippines Uruguay |
7. In accordance with the Resolution 6/99 adopted by the Thirtieth Session of the FAO Conference on 13 November 1999, the Council was required to elect six members of the WFP Executive Board from among FAO Member Nations for the period 1 January 2002 to 31 December 2004.
8. The Council then elected the following members from the following lists to the WFP Executive Board for a term of office of three years (1 January 2002 to 31 December 2004).
List | Members | ||
A | Eritrea Mauritania |
||
B | China | ||
C | Haiti | ||
D | Canada Germany |
9. The Council recalled that at its Hundred and Nineteenth Session it had agreed that, after Spain had stood down on 31 December 2000, it would be replaced by Portugal for the year 2001 and that the replacement of this country for the year 2002 would be communicated before the Hundred and Twenty-second Session of the Council.
10. The Council was informed by a communication dated 10 October 2001 from the Royal Danish Embassy signed by the Election Coordinator for the WFP List D Member Nations that, in accordance with a decision taken at a List D meeting on 2 October 2001, Norway would replace Portugal for the year 2002.
11. The Council therefore noted that Portugal had resigned from the WFP Executive Board and agreed that Norway should occupy the seat thus vacated for the remainder of the term of office expiring 31 December 2002.
12. The Council was informed by a communication dated 12 October 2001 from the Permanent Representative of the State of Kuwait to FAO, as Chairperson of the Regional Group for the Near East, that Iraq had decided to relinquish the WFP Executive Board seat obtained from the FAO Council (January 2001 to December 2003) and to maintain that obtained from ECOSOC (January 2002 to December 2004). The Council was also informed that Syria would complete the remaining two years of the seat obtained from the FAO Council (January 2002 to December 2003).
13. The Council therefore noted that Iraq had resigned from the WFP Executive Board seat obtained from the FAO Council and agreed that Syria should occupy the seat thus vacated for the remainder of the term of office expiring 31 December 2003.
14. The Council noted that there were no matters arising out of the Thirty-first Session of the Conference for the decision of this session of the Council.
15. The Council approved the Calendar of FAO Governing Bodies and Other Main Sessions 2002 and noted the Calendar for 2003, as reproduced in Appendix D to this Report.
16. The Council noted that at its Hundred and Twenty-third Session in October 2002, it would be given the Provisional Calendar 2003-2004 to approve the Calendar for 2003.
17. Members of the Asia and the Pacific Region proposed that the existing formulae for the representation of different regions on the Programme and Finance Committees be reviewed. The proposal was supported by Members from other regions.
18. The Council agreed to discuss this matter at its Hundred and Twenty-third Session in 2002.
19. The Council noted that Mr Paul Ross, Alternate Permanent Representative of Australia to FAO and Ms Neela Gangadharan, Alternate Permanent Representative of India to FAO would shortly be completing their assignements in Rome. The Council expressed its appreciation to Mr Ross and Ms Gangadharan for their outstanding contributions to the work of the Organization, their active participation in Governing Body deliberations and their very constructive interplay with fellow representatives and the FAO Secretariat.
20. The Council extended its best wishes to both Mr Ross and Ms Gangadharan in their future assignments and wish them every success.
21. The Council agreed to convene its Hundred and Twenty-third Session from 28 October to 2 November 2002.
_______________________________________
1 CL 122/1-Rev.2; CL 122/INF/1; CL 122/PV/1.
2 CL 122/LIM/1; CL 122/LIM/1-Corr.1; CL 122/LIM/1-Corr.2; CL 122/LIM/1-Corr.3; CL 122/PV/1.
3 CL 122/LIM/2; CL 122/LIM/2-Corr.1; CL 122/LIM/2-Corr.2; CL 122/PV/1.
5 CL 121/8-Rev.1; CL 122/INF/2; CL 122/LIM/4; CL 122/PV/1.
* * *
1. |
Adoption of the Agenda |
2. |
Election of three Vice-Chairpersons |
3. |
Election of the Chairperson and Members of the Programme Committee |
4. |
Election of the Chairperson and Members of the Finance Committee |
5. |
Election of Members of the Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
6. |
Election of six Members of the WFP Executive Board |
7. | Matters Arising out of the Conference Session |
8. | Provisional Calendar of FAO Governing Bodies and other Main Sessions 2002-2003 |
9. | Any Other Matters |
This Appendix is available in PDF format
CL 122/1-Rev.1 |
Provisional Annotated Agenda |
CL 122/2 |
Provisional Calendar of FAO Governing Bodies and Other Main Sessions 2002-2003 |
CL 122/INF/Series |
|
CL 122/INF/1 |
Statement of Competence and Voting Rights Submitted by the European Community (EC) and its Member States |
CL 122/INF/2 |
Membership of the World Food Programme Executive Board |
CL 122/INF/3 |
Provisional List of Documents |
CL 122/LIM/Series |
|
CL 122/LIM/1 |
Election of Chairperson and Members of the Programme Committee |
CL 122/LIM/1-Corr.1 |
Corrigendum to CL 122/LIM/1 |
CL 122/LIM/1-Corr.2 |
Corrigendum to CL 122/LIM/1 |
CL 122/LIM/1-Corr.3 |
Corrigendum to CL 122/LIM/1 |
CL 122/LIM/2 |
Election of Chairperson and Members of the Finance Committee |
CL 122/LIM/2-Corr.1 |
Corrigendum to CL 122/LIM/2 |
CL 122/LIM/3 |
Election of Members of the Constitutional and Legal Matters |
CL 122/LIM/4 |
Election of Six Members of the WFP Executive Board |
CL 122/PV/Series |
|
CL 122/PV/1 |
Provisional Verbatim Records of Plenary |
CL 122/OD/Series |
|
CL 122/OD/1 |
Order of the Day |
|
|
|
2002 |
2003 |
|||
JANUARY |
||||
FEBRUARY |
22 ARC |
4 - 8 |
25 COFI |
24 - 28 |
MARCH |
25 NERC |
9 - 13 |
16 COFO |
10 - 14 |
APRIL |
73 CCLM |
8 - 9/4 |
75 CCLM |
8 - 9 |
MAY |
87 PC |
6 - 10 |
89 PC |
5 - 9 |
JUNE |
28 CFS |
6 - 8 |
124 CL |
23 - 28 |
JULY |
||||
AUGUST |
||||
SEPTEMBER |
88 PC |
9 - 13 |
90 PC |
15 - 19 |
OCTOBER |
74 CCLM |
2 - 3 |
WFD |
16 |
NOVEMBER |
125 CL |
26 - 28 |
||
DECEMBER |
126 CL |
11 |
Eid Al-Adha: |
23 Feb 02 |
Eid Al-Adha: |
12 Feb 03 |
Easter: |
31 Mar 02 |
Easter: |
20 Apr 03 |
Ramadan: |
6 Nov-5 Dec 02 |
Ramadan: |
27 Oct-24 Nov 03 |
Eid Al-Fitr: |
6 Dec 02 |
Eid Al-Fitr: |
25 Nov 03 |
APRC |
Regional Conference for Asia and the Pacific |
ERC |
Regional Conference for Europe |
ARC |
Regional Conference for Africa |
FC |
Finance Committee |
C |
Conference |
LARC |
Regional Conference for Latin America and the Caribbean |
CCLM |
Committee on Constitutional and |
NERC |
Regional Conference for the Near East |
CCP |
Committee on Commodity Problems |
PC |
Programme Committee |
CFS |
Committee on World Food Security |
WFC |
World Forestry Congress |
CL |
Council |
WFD | World Food Day |
COAG |
Committee on Agriculture |
WFS: fyl |
World Food Summit: five years later |
COFI |
Committee on Fisheries |
|
|
COFO |
Committee on Forestry |
(November 2001 - November 2003)
Chairperson | Members | |
Netherlands (J. Berteling) | Australia (B. Hughes) | Lebanon (A.H. Haidar) |
Cameroon (M. Samatana) | Malaysia (R. Bin Khalid) | |
Canada (B. Hankey) | Mali (M.M. Touré) | |
China (Z. Tang) | Paraguay (Ms A.M. Baiardi Quesnel) | |
Colombia (B. Gutiérrez Zuluaga Botero) |
(November 2001 - November 2003)
Chairperson | Members | |
Chile (H.O. Molina Reyes) | Japan (M. Ito) | Switzerland (R. Gerber) |
Kuwait (Ms F.J. Hayat) | Tanzania, United Republic of (Ms P.M. Hingi) | |
Pakistan (A.B. Khan) | United Kingdom (A. Beattie) | |
Senegal (A. Diouf) | United States of America (Ms C. Heileman) |
(November 2001 - November 2003)
Canada France Iraq Malta |
Niger Philippines Uruguay |
Term of office expiring | Elected by FAO Council | Elected by ECOSOC |
31 December 2002 | Egypt (A)1 | France (D) |
Madagascar (A)1 | Hungary (E) | |
Norway (D) 2 | Iran, Islamic Republic of (B) | |
Peru (C) | Japan (D) | |
Romania (E) | Mexico (C) | |
Switzerland (D)3 | Swaziland (A) | |
31 December 2003 | Bangladesh (B) | Denmark (D) |
El Salvador (C) | India (B) | |
Mali (A) | Italy (D) | |
Netherlands (D) | Pakistan (B) | |
Syria (B)4 | Russian Federation (E) | |
United States of America (D) | Sierra Leone (A) | |
31 December 2004 | Canada (D) | Algeria (A) |
China (B) | Australia (D) | |
Eritrea (A) | Cameroon (A) | |
Germany (D) | Cuba (C) | |
Haiti (C) | Iraq (B) | |
Mauritania (A) | United Kingdom (D) | |
1 One of these seats rotates between the States in List A (2000-2002), List A (2006-2008) and List C (2009-2011). 2 Replaced Portugal. 3 Replaced Australia. 4 Replaced Iraq.
|
(at 14 November 2001)
Afghanistan Albania Algeria Angola Antigua and Barbuda Argentina Armenia Australia Austria Azerbaijan Bahamas Bahrain Bangladesh Barbados Belgium Belize Benin Bhutan Bolivia Bosnia and Herzegovina Botswana Brazil Bulgaria Burkina Faso Burundi Cambodia Cameroon Canada Cape Verde Central African Republic Chad Chile China Colombia Comoros Congo, Democratic Republic of Congo, Republic of Cook Islands Costa Rica Côte d'Ivoire Croatia Cuba Cyprus Czech Republic Democratic People's Republic of Korea Denmark Djibouti Dominica Dominican Republic Ecuador Egypt El Salvador Equatorial Guinea Eritrea Estonia Ethiopia European Community (Member Organization) Fiji Finland France Gabon |
Gambia Georgia Germany Ghana Greece Grenada Guatemala Guinea Guinea-Bissau Guyana Haiti Honduras Hungary Iceland India Indonesia Iran, Islamic Republic of Iraq Ireland Israel Italy Jamaica Japan Jordan Kazakhstan Kenya Kiribati Korea, Republic of Kuwait Kyrgyzstan Lao People's Democratic Republic Latvia Lebanon Lesotho Liberia Libya Lithuania Luxembourg Madagascar Malawi Malaysia Maldives Mali Malta Marshall Islands Mauritania Mauritius Mexico Moldova, Republic of Monaco Mongolia Morocco Mozambique Myanmar Namibia Nauru Nepal Netherlands New Zealand Nicaragua Niger Nigeria Niue |
Norway Oman Pakistan Palau Panama Papua New Guinea Paraguay Peru Philippines Poland Portugal Qatar Romania Rwanda Saint Kitts and Nevis Saint Lucia Saint Vincent and the Grenadines Samoa San Marino Sao Tome and Principe Saudi Arabia, Kingdom of Senegal Seychelles Sierra Leone Slovakia Slovenia Solomon Islands Somalia South Africa Spain Sri Lanka Sudan Suriname Swaziland Sweden Switzerland Syria Tajikistan Tanzania, United Republic of Thailand The Former Yugoslav Republic of Macedonia Togo Tonga Trinidad and Tobago Tunisia Turkey Turkmenistan Uganda United Arab Emirates United Kingdom United States of America Uruguay Uzbekistan Vanuatu Venezuela Viet Nam Yemen Yugoslavia Zambia Zimbabwe |