(Additions are underlined; deletions are in square brackets)
TERMINATION
Staff Regulation 301.091:
“The Director-General may terminate the appointment of a staff member who holds a confirmed permanent or indefinite appointment [and whose probationary period has been completed] if the necessities of the service require abolition of the post or reduction of staff, if the services of the individual concerned prove unsatisfactory, or if he is, for reasons of health, incapacitated for further service.”
Staff Regulation 301.0912:
“The Director-General may terminate the appointment of a staff member with a confirmed fixed-term appointment prior to the expiration date for any of the reasons specified in 301.091 above, or for such other reasons as may be specified in the letter of appointment.”
Staff Regulation 301.0913:
“In the case of [all other staff members, including] staff members serving a probationary period [for a permanent appointment] or holding any other type of appointment not referred to in 301.091 and 301.0912 above, the Director-General may at any time terminate the appointment if, in his opinion, such action would be in the interests of the Organization.”
TERMINATION INDEMNITY
Staff Regulation 301.153:
“Except as provided in 301.155 and 301.156 below, staff members who have appointments for a fixed term of 12 months or more [over six months] which are terminated prior to the expiration date specified in the letter of appointment shall be paid one week's indemnity pay for each month of uncompleted service, but not less than six weeks' nor more than three months' indemnity pay.”
Staff Regulation 301.1553:
“No indemnity payment shall be made to:
A staff member who has an appointment for a fixed term which is completed on the expiration date or terminated during the probationary period specified in the letter of appointment; ”
MEMBERS OF FAO COUNCIL | MEMBRES DU CONSEIL DE LA FAO | MIEMBROS DEL CONSEJO DE LA FAO | |||
AFGHANISTAN | 3 | GREECE | 2 | POLAND | 2 |
ARGENTINA | 2 | INDIA | 1 | SENEGAL | 1 |
BRAZIL | 3 | IVORY COAST | 3 | SUDAN | 3 |
CANADA | 3 | JAPAN | 2 | TUNISIA | 3 |
CHAD | 2 | JORDAN | 1 | UGANDA | 1 |
COLOMBIA | 3 | KENYA | 3 | UNITED KINGDOM | 1 |
COSTA RICA | 3 | KOREA | 2 | UNITED STATES OF AMERICA | 3 |
ETHIOPIA | 2 | MALAYSIA | 2 | VENEZUELA | 1 |
FINLAND | 1 | NEW ZEALAND | 1 | YUGOSLAVIA | 3 |
FRANCE | 1 | PAKISTAN | 1 | ||
GERMANY Fed. Rep. | 2 | PERU | 2 |
MEMBERS OF FAO COUNCIL
Independent Chairman: Maurice Gemayel
The composition of the Council until 31 December 1966 was as follows:
Afghanistan 3
Argentina 2
Brazil 3
Canada 3
Chad 2
Colombia 3
Costa Rica 3
Ethiopia 2
Finland 1
France 1
Germany, Federal Republic of 2
Greece 2
India 1
Ivory Coast 3
Japan 2
Jordan 1
Kenya 3
Korea, Republic of 2
Malaysia 2
New Zealand 1
Pakistan 1
Peru 2
Poland 2
Senegal 1
Sudan 3
Tunisia 3
Uganda 1
United Kingdom 1
United States of America 3
Venezuela 1
Yugoslavia 3
The composition of the Council from 1 January 1967 is as follows:
Afghanistan 3
Argentina 2
Australia 4
Brazil 3
Canada 3
Chad 2
Chile 4
Colombia 3
Costa Rica 3
Ethiopia 2
France 4
Germany, Fed. Rep. of 2
Greece 2
India 4
Ivory Coast 3
Japan 2
Kenya 3
Korea, Republic of 2
Malaysia 2
Mali 4
Pakistan 4
Peru 2
Poland 2
Sudan 3
Sweden 4
Tunisia 3
Uganda 4
United Arab Republic 4
United Kingdom 4
United States of America 3
Yugoslavia 3
1 Term of office until 31 December 1966
2 Term of office until conclusion of the Fourteenth Session of the Conference, November 1967
3 Term of office until 31 December 1968
4 Term of office until conclusion of the Fifteenth Session of the Conference, November 1969
COUNCIL STANDING COMMITTEES
9 December 1965 – November 1967
PROGRAM COMMITTEE
Chairman:
Michel Cépède (France)
Members:
G. Bula Hoyos (Colombia)
A. Devatchi (Iran)
M.J.L. Dols (Netherlands)
M. Khurshid (Pakistan)
C.F. Pennison (United Kingdom) (retired),
R.W. Phillips (United States of America)
First Alternate:
E. Saari (Finland)
Second Alternate:
Mme M.T. Basse (Senegal)
FINANCE COMMITTEE
Chairman:
J.C. Nagle (Ireland)
Members:
A.A. Aramburú (Peru)
Y. Duraiswamy (Ceylon)
R. Gibb (United States of America)
L. Maire (Switzerland) (retired)
First Alternate:
A. Löchen (Norway)
Second Alternate:
A.J.P.M. Ssentongo (Uganda)
COMMITTEE ON COMMODITY PROBLEMS
Argentina
Australia
Brazil
Canada
Ceylon
Costa Rica
France
Germany, Federal Republic of
Ghana
India
Ireland
Italy
Japan
Madagascar
Malaysia
Netherlands
New Zealand
Nigeria
Pakistan
Philippines
Romania
Senegal
Spain
Sudan
Sweden
Switzerland
Thailand
Trinidad and Tobago
United Kingdom
United States of America
COMMITTEE ON FISHERIES
Argentina
Australia
Brazil
Canada
Chile
Ecuador
Ethiopia
France
Germany, Federal Republic of
Ghana
Iceland
India
Iran
Italy
Japan
Korea, Republic of
Madagascar
Mexico
Morocco
Norway
Pakistan
Peru
Poland
Senegal
Spain
Sudan
Thailand
United Arab Republic
United Kingdom
United States of America
COMMITTEE ON CONSTITUTIONAL AND LEGAL MATTERS
Australia
France
Morocco
Netherlands
United Kingdom
United States of America
Uruguay
OTHER COMMITTEES
FAO/UN INTERGOVERNMENTAL COMMITTEE FOR THE WORLD FOOD PROGRAM
The composition of the IGC until 31 December 1966 was as follows:
Argentina*
Australia
Brazil
Canada*
Ceylon*
Colombia*
Denmark
France*
Germany, Fed. Rep. of*
Ghana
India*
Ireland
Jamaica*
Mexico
Netherlands*
New Zealand*
Nigeria*
Pakistan
Peru
Sweden
Turkey
United Arab Republic
United Kingdom
United States of America*
The composition of the IGC from 1 January 1967 is as follows:
Argentina*
Australia
Brazil
Canada*
Ceylon*
Colombia*
Denmark
France*
Germany, Fed. Rep. of*
Ghana
India*
Ireland
Korea, Republic of*
Mexico
Netherlands*
New Zealand*
Nigeria*
Pakistan
Peru
Sweden
Turkey
United Arab Republic
United Kingdom
United States of America*
AD HOC REVIEW COMMITTEE ON THE ORGANIZATION'S GENERAL STRUCTURE
Australia (A.C.B. Maiden)
Chile (F.A. Pinto Santa Cruz)
France (M. Cépède)
Pakistan (M. Khurshid)
Senegal (E.C. Basse)
United Arab Republic (A.A. Moursi)
United States of America (Mrs D.H. Jacobson)
AD HOC COMMITTEE ON FOOD PRODUCTION RESOURCES PROGRAM
Australia
Brazil
Canada
Denmark
Ethiopia
France
Germany, Fed. Rep. of
India
Iran
Italy
Japan
Korea, Rep. of
Netherlands
Pakistan
Poland
Senegal
Sudan
United Kingdom
United States of America
Venezuela