FIJI | |
Date of Accession |
8.11.1971 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1989, 1993 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
1975 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
|
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
FINLAND | |
Date of Accession |
27.8.1947 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1950** |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1948, 1961, 1963, 1965, 1967, 1969, 1971, 1979, 1999 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1950**, 1989 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1948*, 1975, 1981, 1997 |
Credentials Committee |
1961, 1965, 2001 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1953, 1977, 1989 |
Membership |
1951-54, 1963-66, 1975-78, 1987-90, 2003-05 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1959-61, 1963-67(A) |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1973-75 |
FRANCE | |
Date of Accession |
16.10.1945 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
A. Mayer (1950**) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
1957, 1975, 1981, 1993 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1946, 1949, 1953, 1959, 1961, 1965, 1967, 1969, 1973, 1993, 1995, 1997 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1945, 1946, 1947, 1948, 1948*, 1949, 1950**, 1951, 1953, 1955, 1956***, 1957, 1959, 1961, 1963, 1965, 1967, 1971, 1975, 1981, 1985, 1991 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1945, 1946, 1949, 1959, 1969, 1973, 1987 |
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
Michel Cépède (1969-73) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
1947, 1948-August, 1948-November, 1949-June, |
Membership |
1947-2005 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
M. Cépède (1963-69), M. Mazoyer (1985-91) |
Membership |
1947-55, 1957-59(A), 1959-69, 1981-91 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1947-48, 1954-57, 1961-63(A), 1969-71(A), 1971-73 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1951-61, 1963-71, 1973-81, 1987-2003 |
Date of Accession |
9.11.1961 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1977 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1979 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1977 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1974 |
Membership |
1973-77, 1987-92 , 1995-98 , 1999-2004 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
______________________________
6 Gabon resigned from the Council on 1 January 1991.
7 Gabon resigned from the Council on 1 January 1996 and was re-elected by the Conference in November 1997.
GAMBIA | |
Date of Accession |
22.11.1965 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1971 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1977 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1987, 1993 |
Credentials Committee |
1973 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
1975-77, 1983-89 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1977-79 |
GEORGIA | |
Date of Accession |
20.10.1995 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1997 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1997 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
|
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
GERMANY 8 | |
Date of Accession |
27.11.1950 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1967, 1975, 1985, 1999, 2001 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1955, 1969, 1973, 1983, 1991, 1997 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1956***, 1957, 1971, 1979, 1987 |
Credentials Committee |
1957, 1993, 1995, 1999 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1961, 1969, 1976, 1981, 1982, 1989, 1994, 1997, 1999, 2003 |
Membership |
1959-61, 1965-2003 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
D.F.R. Bommer (1991-99) |
Membership |
1955-57, 1973-75, 1975-77(A), 1991-99 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1959-61, 1971-73, 1983-87 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1959-61 |
____________________________________
8 On 3 October 1990, the German Democratic Republic was merged with the Federal Republic of Germany.
GHANA | |
Date of Accession |
9.11.1957 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1961, 1967, 1969, 1987, 1989, 1991 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1993 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1959, 1961, 1965, 1973, 1983, 1989 |
Credentials Committee |
1961, 1969, 1981 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1989, 1991, 1995-November |
Membership |
1959-62, 1977-81, 1989-92, 1995-98, 2001-04 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1975-77(A), 1981-83 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1959-61 |
GREECE | |
Date of Accession |
16.10.1945 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1963 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1946, 1949, 1961 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1963 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1945, 1949, 1979 |
Credentials Committee |
1946, 1950**, 1955, 1989, 1991 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1977, 1979 |
Membership |
1965-67, 1977-79, 1989-91, 1997-2000 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1979-83 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
GRENADA | |
Date of Accession |
8.11.1975 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1979-81 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
|
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
GUATEMALA | |
Date of Accession |
16.10.1945 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
2001 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
1948, 1975, 1991 |
Credentials Committee |
1977 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1999 |
Membership |
1999-2005 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
GUINEA | |
Date of Accession |
5.11.1959 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1975 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1993, 1997 |
Credentials Committee |
1979 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1975 |
Membership |
1973-76, 1987-90 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1975-81 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
GUINEA-BISSAU | |
Date of Accession |
26.11.1973 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1975 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
1977-79 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
GUYANA | |
Date of Accession |
22.8.1966 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
|
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
HAITI | |
Date of Accession |
16.10.1945 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1957, 1997 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1951 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1945, 1950**, 1956*** |
Credentials Committee |
1946, 1957, 1975, 1997, 1999 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
|
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1953-55 |
HONDURAS | |
Date of Accession |
16.10.1945 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1973 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
1997 |
Credentials Committee |
1951, 1957, 1991, 1993 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1994 |
Membership |
1993-99 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
HUNGARY 9 | |
Date of Accession |
16.11.1967 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1979, 1985, 1991, 1997 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1971 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1947 |
Credentials Committee |
1975, 1977, 1983, 1991, 1995, 1997 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1974, 1993 |
Membership |
1971-74, 1977-80, 1987-89, 1991-94, 1999-2001 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1979-83 |
____________________________
9 Hungary had been FAO Member from 1945 to 1952.
ICELAND | |
Date of Accession |
16.10.1945 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
1953 |
Credentials Committee |
1948, 1951, 1955, 1957 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
1999-2002 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
INDIA | |
Date of Accession |
16.10.1945 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1946, 1950**, 1955, 1971, 1985, 2001 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1947, 1948, 1949, 1951, 1953, 1963, 1965, 1967, 1969, 1975, 1979, 1987, 1989, 1997, 1999 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1945, 1946, 1948, 1948*, 1950**, 1951, 1955, 1956***, 1959, 1961, 1965, 1971, 1983, 1985, 1989 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1946, 1948, 1969, 1973 |
Credentials Committee |
1947, 1949, 1963, 1977 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
M.S. Swaminathan (1981-85) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
1948, 1949-June, 1949-November, 1949-December, 1954, 1963, 1973, 1985, 1987, 1992, 1993, 2000, 2001-November |
Membership |
1947-2005 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1951, 1953-59, 1961-63, 1967-71, 1971-73(A), 1973-75, 1977-89, 1991-95 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1947-50, 1957-61, 1963-65(A), 1997-2001 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1959-61, 1963-65 |
INDONESIA | |
Date of Accession |
28.11.1949 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
T. Hadiwijaya (1977) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
1959 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1957, 1967, 1969, 1971, 1973, 1979, 1983 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1950**, 1959, 1975, 1977 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1950*, 1959, 1961, 1981, 1983 |
Credentials Committee |
1999 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
S. Baharsjah (1997-2001) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
1962, 1973, 1975, 1984, 1991 |
Membership |
1955-64, 1967-2000, 2003-05 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1987-91, 1999-2001 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1973-75 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1953-57 |
IRAN, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF | |
Date of Accession |
1.12.1953 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
M. Rouhani (1975) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
1957, 1999 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1963, 1977, 1993, 1997 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1957, 1975, 2001 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1965, 1971, 1987, 1999 |
Credentials Committee |
1955, 1961 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1961-October, 1961-November, 1964, 1965, 1971, 1973, 1990, 1997, 2001, 2003 |
Membership |
1957-65, 1971-74, 1987-2003 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1963-67, 1967-69(A), 1977-79 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1969-71(A) |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1961-63 |
IRAQ | |
Date of Accession |
16.10.1945 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1949, 1981 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1965, 1975, 1977, 1979, 1989, 1995, 1999 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1949, 1957, 1981 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1945, 1947, 1979, 1995 |
Credentials Committee |
1945, 1950**, 1953, 1999 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
1953-56, 1969-71, 1977-91 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1995-97, 1999-2003 |
IRELAND | |
Date of Accession |
3.9.1946 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1948 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1948 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1947, 1953 |
Credentials Committee |
1959, 1979 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
1961-64, 1981-83, 1995-98 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
J. Nagle (1961-71) |
Membership |
1953-71 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1951-57 |
ISRAEL | |
Date of Accession |
23.11.1949 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
1955 |
Credentials Committee |
1951 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
1967-68 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1953-55 |
ITALY | |
Date of Accession |
12.9.1946 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
A. Fanfani (1951) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
1977 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1949, 1953, 1967, 1969, 1973, 1975, 1999 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1951, 1977 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1949, 1951, 1956***, 1963, 1999 |
Credentials Committee |
1947, 1949, 1956***, 1967, 1975 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1952, 1954, 1962, 1972, 1985, 1987, 1998 |
Membership |
1947-65, 1971-2005 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1985-99 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1947-53, 1971-97 |
JAMAICA | |
Date of Accession |
13.3.1963 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
S. Mullings (1993) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1993 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
1977-80 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1999-2001 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
JAPAN | |
Date of Accession |
21.11.1951 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
E.S. Nasu (1963) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1953, 1967, 1975, 1995 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1963, 1971, 1973 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1953, 1956***, 1957, 1963, 1965, 1967, 1973, 1977, 1983, 1989, 1991 |
Credentials Committee |
1955, 1999 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1955-October, 1955-November, 1957, 1975, 1997 |
Membership |
1953-61, 1965-2003 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1969-75, 1975-77(A), 1993-99 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
2001-2003 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1971-73 |
JORDAN | |
Date of Accession |
23.1.1951 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1977 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1955, 1961, 1967 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1977 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1956***, 1961, 1969 |
Credentials Committee |
1963, 1971 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1975 |
Membership |
1963-66, 1975-77 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1973-75(A), 1975-77 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1955-57 |
KAZAKHSTAN | |
Date of Accession |
7.11.1997 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
|
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
KENYA | |
Date of Accession |
27.1.1964 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1967 |
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
1977, 1991, 1997, 1999 |
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1967, 1969, 1987 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1971 |
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1972, 1974 |
Membership |
1965-68, 1971-74, 1981-83, 1987-93, 2001-03 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1977-81 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1969-71, 1971-73(A) |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
1991-93 |
KIRIBATI | |
Date of Accession |
15.11.1999 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
|
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
KOREA, REPUBLIC OF | |
Date of Accession |
25.11.1949 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1997 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1967, 1971, 1999 |
Credentials Committee |
1951, 1953 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
1993 |
Membership |
1965-67, 1989-2003 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1971-73(A) |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1999-2001 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
KUWAIT | |
Date of Accession |
9.11.1961 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
F.A. Al-Khaled (1987) |
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
1981, 1987 |
Nominations Committee (B) |
1965, 1967, 1979, 1993 |
Credentials Committee |
1977 |
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
1973-75, 1979-81, 1995-2001 |
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
1981-83, 1989-95 |
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
2001-2003 |
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |
KYRGYZSTAN | |
Date of Accession |
8.11.1993 |
CONFERENCE | |
Chairperson |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Chairperson, Vice-Chairpersons of Commissions and Committees |
|
Membership of | |
General Committee |
|
Nominations Committee (B) |
|
Credentials Committee |
|
COUNCIL | |
Independent Chairman |
|
Vice-Chairpersons |
|
Membership |
|
COUNCIL COMMITTEES | |
Programme Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Finance Committee | |
Chairperson |
|
Membership |
|
Committee on Constitutional and Legal Matters |