CL 126/INF/2 |
Hundred and Twenty-sixth Session |
Rome, 11 December 2003 |
MEMBERSHIP OF THE WFP EXECUTIVE BOARD |
1. The Composition of the WFP Executive Board is as follows:
Term of office Expiring |
Elected by FAO Council |
Elected by ECOSOC |
31 December 2003 |
Bangladesh (B) |
Denmark (D) |
31 December 2004 |
Canada (D) |
Algeria (A) |
31 December 2005 |
Belgium (D) |
Iran, Islamic Republic of (B) |
31 December 2006 |
To be elected by CL 126 |
India (B) |
_______________________
1 This seat rotates between lists A, B and C as follows: List A (2000-2002), List B (2003-2005), List A (2006-2008) and List C (2009-2011)
2 Will be replaced by Finland for the years 2004 and 2005